DC PR25-0448 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-01 - Resolution R25-0357, Effective from Nov 21, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 015491
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-01 - Resolution R25-0357, Effective from Nov 21, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 015491
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Chief Tenant Advocate of the Office of the Tenant Advocate Johanna Shreve Confirmation Resolution of 2023
Title
Chief Tenant Advocate of the Office of the Tenant Advocate Johanna Shreve Confirmation Resolution of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-11-21 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-01 | Council | Resolution R25-0357, Effective from Nov 21, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 015491 |
2023-11-21 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-11-21 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0357 |
2023-11-16 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2023-11-09 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0448 |
2023-11-07 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2023-11-02 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2023-10-27 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-10-19 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-10-06 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0448 Published in the DC Register |
2023-10-03 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing |
2023-09-29 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |