DC PR25-0415 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - Resolution R25-0331, Effective from Nov 07, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 015037
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Board of Optometry Dr. Gregory D. Foley Confirmation Resolution of 2023

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Board of Optometry Dr. Gregory D. Foley Confirmation Resolution of 2023

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-11-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-11-17CouncilResolution R25-0331, Effective from Nov 07, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 015037
2023-11-07CouncilApproved with Resolution Number R25-0331
2023-11-07CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2023-11-02CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2023-11-01CouncilCommittee Mark-up of PR25-0415
2023-10-31CouncilNotice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
2023-10-24CouncilRoundtable Hearing Held
2023-10-20CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2023-10-18CouncilNotice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
2023-10-13CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2023-10-06CouncilNotice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
2023-10-03CouncilReferred to Committee on Health
2023-09-29CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR25-0415 Published in the DC Register
2023-09-19CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback