DC PR25-0386 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Passed on November 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - Resolution R25-0342, Effective from Nov 07, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 015048
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Passed on November 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - Resolution R25-0342, Effective from Nov 07, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 015048
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sense of the Council on the Opioid and Fentanyl Epidemic Resolution of 2023
Title
Sense of the Council on the Opioid and Fentanyl Epidemic Resolution of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-11-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-17 | Council | Resolution R25-0342, Effective from Nov 07, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 015048 |
2023-11-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0342 |
2023-11-07 | Council | Final Reading |
2023-11-02 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2023-11-01 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0386 |
2023-10-31 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2023-10-26 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2023-10-18 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2023-10-13 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-10-06 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2023-10-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-10-03 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2023-09-29 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0386 Published in the DC Register |
2023-09-18 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |