DC PR25-0305 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-20 - Resolution R25-0284, Effective from Oct 03, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 013883
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Board of Occupational Therapy Charles Bond Confirmation Resolution of 2023

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Board of Occupational Therapy Charles Bond Confirmation Resolution of 2023

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-10-03 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-20CouncilResolution R25-0284, Effective from Oct 03, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 013883
2023-10-03CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2023-10-03CouncilApproved with Resolution Number R25-0284
2023-09-27CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2023-09-26CouncilCommittee Mark-up of PR25-0305
2023-09-25CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2023-09-11CouncilNotice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
2023-08-25CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2023-08-22CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2023-07-14CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR25-0305 Published in the DC Register
2023-07-11CouncilReferred to Committee on Health
2023-06-26CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback