DC PR25-0263 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-02 - Resolution R25-0192, Effective from Jul 11, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 001219
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Commission on the Arts and Humanities Chase Maggiano Confirmation Resolution of 2023

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commission on the Arts and Humanities Chase Maggiano Confirmation Resolution of 2023

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-07-11 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-02CouncilResolution R25-0192, Effective from Jul 11, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 001219
2023-07-28CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2023-07-11CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2023-07-11CouncilCommittee Mark-up of PR25-0263
2023-06-30CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2023-06-23CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2023-06-20CouncilReferred to Committee on Committee of the Whole
2023-06-16CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2023-06-16CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR25-0263 Published in the DC Register
2023-06-07CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback