DC PR25-0133 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-17 - Resolution R25-0076, Effective from Mar 07, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 003296
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-17 - Resolution R25-0076, Effective from Mar 07, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 003296
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Contract No. CW98891 with Run Veggie, LLC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023
Title
Contract No. CW98891 with Run Veggie, LLC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-17 | Council | Resolution R25-0076, Effective from Mar 07, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 003296 |
2023-03-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0076 |
2023-03-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-03-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-03-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |