DC PR25-0045 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-17 - Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-17 - Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic Beverage Control Board Nathaniel Sims Confirmation Resolution of 2022
Title
Alcoholic Beverage Control Board Nathaniel Sims Confirmation Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-17 | Council | Withdrawn |
2023-02-06 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2023-02-03 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-01-31 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-01-13 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0045 Published in the DC Register |
2022-12-20 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2022-12-13 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR25-0045 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/52005/Introduction/PR25-0045-Introduction.pdf |