DC PR25-0042 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-17 - Resolution R25-0029 Published in DC Register Page 002122
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-17 - Resolution R25-0029 Published in DC Register Page 002122
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Board of Veterinary Medicine Sophie Stenner Confirmation Resolution of 2022
Title
Board of Veterinary Medicine Sophie Stenner Confirmation Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-17 | Council | Resolution R25-0029 Published in DC Register Page 002122 |
2023-02-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-01-31 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2023-01-30 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0042 |
2023-01-26 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2023-01-13 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0042 Published in the DC Register |
2022-12-20 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2022-12-07 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |