DC PR24-1074 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - Resolution R24-0696, Effective from Dec 06, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 015328
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - Resolution R24-0696, Effective from Dec 06, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 015328
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modification Nos. M02, M03, and M04 to Contract No. DCAM-20-NC-RFP-0013-A4 with Blue Skye Construction, LLC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2022
Title
Modification Nos. M02, M03, and M04 to Contract No. DCAM-20-NC-RFP-0013-A4 with Blue Skye Construction, LLC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-12-06 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-23 | Council | Resolution R24-0696, Effective from Dec 06, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 015328 |
2022-12-06 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0696 |
2022-12-06 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-12-06 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-11-17 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |