DC PR24-1051 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-20 - Approved with Resolution Number R24-0723
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-20 - Approved with Resolution Number R24-0723
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
District of Columbia State Athletics Commission Sarah Navarro Confirmation Resolution of 2022
Title
District of Columbia State Athletics Commission Sarah Navarro Confirmation Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-12-20 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-20 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0723 |
2022-12-20 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-12-08 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2022-11-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-22 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-18 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-1051 Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-15 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2022-11-10 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |