DC PR24-1047 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-06 - Resolution R24-0727, Effective from Dec 20, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 000031
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-06 - Resolution R24-0727, Effective from Dec 20, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 000031
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public Service Commission Ted Trabue, Jr. Confirmation Resolution of 2022
Title
Public Service Commission Ted Trabue, Jr. Confirmation Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-12-20 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-06 | Council | Resolution R24-0727, Effective from Dec 20, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 000031 |
2022-12-20 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0727 |
2022-12-20 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-12-16 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-12-13 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR24-1047 |
2022-12-12 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2022-12-07 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-12-07 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-11-18 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-18 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-1047 Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-16 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-15 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2022-11-10 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |