DC PR24-1029 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-18 - Resolution R24-0676, Effective from Nov 01, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 014199
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-18 - Resolution R24-0676, Effective from Nov 01, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 014199
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Foreclosure Moratorium and Homeowner Assistance Fund Coordination Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2022
Title
Foreclosure Moratorium and Homeowner Assistance Fund Coordination Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-11-01 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-18 | Council | Resolution R24-0676, Effective from Nov 01, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 014199 |
2022-11-15 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-11-01 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0676 |
2022-11-01 | Council | Final Reading |
2022-10-31 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |