DC PR24-1025 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-18 - Resolution R24-0658, Effective from Nov 01, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 014183
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-18 - Resolution R24-0658, Effective from Nov 01, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 014183
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Performing Arts Promotion Tax Rebate Clarification Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2022
Title
Performing Arts Promotion Tax Rebate Clarification Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-11-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-18 | Council | Resolution R24-0658, Effective from Nov 01, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 014183 |
2022-11-01 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0658 |
2022-11-01 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-11-01 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-10-31 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |