DC PR24-0995 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-12 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-12 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Closing of a Portion of a Public Alley in Square 4053, S.O. 22-00410, Approval Resolution of 2022
Title
Closing of a Portion of a Public Alley in Square 4053, S.O. 22-00410, Approval Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-12 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-12-12 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-12-12 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-12-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-23 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-18 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-08 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-10-21 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0995 Published in the DC Register |
2022-10-18 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2022-10-17 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR24-0995 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/51466/Introduction/PR24-0995-Introduction.pdf |