DC PR24-0937 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-08 - Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-08 - Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Students in the Care of D.C. Coordinating Committee LaShunda Hill Confirmation Resolution of 2022
Title
Students in the Care of D.C. Coordinating Committee LaShunda Hill Confirmation Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-08 | Council | Withdrawn |
2022-11-02 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-10-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-10-04 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2022-09-30 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-09-30 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0937 Published in the DC Register |
2022-09-16 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR24-0937 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/51290/Introduction/PR24-0937-Introduction.pdf |