DC PR24-0933 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-15 - Approved with Resolution Number R24-0677
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-15 - Approved with Resolution Number R24-0677
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Students in the Care of D.C. Coordinating Committee David Domenici Confirmation Resolution of 2022
Title
Students in the Care of D.C. Coordinating Committee David Domenici Confirmation Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-11-15 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-15 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0677 |
2022-11-15 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-11-02 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-10-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-10-04 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2022-09-30 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-09-30 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0933 Published in the DC Register |
2022-09-16 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |