DC PR24-0924 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-09 - Referred to Committee on Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-09 - Referred to Committee on Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Director of the Office of Unified Communications Karima Holmes Confirmation Resolution of 2022
Title
Director of the Office of Unified Communications Karima Holmes Confirmation Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-09 | Council | Referred to Committee on Retained by the Council |
2022-12-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Retained by the Council |
2022-12-06 | Council | Agendized; not considered at the request of CM Allen ANS |
2022-12-06 | Council | Agendized; not considered at the request of Chairman Mendelson |
2022-12-05 | Council | Withdrawn |
2022-09-23 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0924 Published in the DC Register |
2022-09-20 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2022-09-16 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR24-0924 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/51248/Introduction/PR24-0924-Introduction.pdf |