DC PR24-0860 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-22 - Resolution R24-0593, Effective from Jul 12, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 008933
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-22 - Resolution R24-0593, Effective from Jul 12, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 008933
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
2662 Martin Luther King, Jr. Avenue, Southeast Tax Sale Certificate Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2022
Title
2662 Martin Luther King, Jr. Avenue, Southeast Tax Sale Certificate Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-07-12 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-12 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-12 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-22 | Council | Resolution R24-0593, Effective from Jul 12, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 008933 |
2022-07-12 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0593 |
2022-07-12 | Council | Final Reading |
2022-07-12 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-07-11 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |