DC PR24-0855 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-22 - Resolution R24-0551, Effective from Jul 12, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 008896
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-22 - Resolution R24-0551, Effective from Jul 12, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 008896
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Advisory Neighborhood Commission Boundaries Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2022
Title
Advisory Neighborhood Commission Boundaries Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-07-12 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-12 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-12 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-22 | Council | Resolution R24-0551, Effective from Jul 12, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 008896 |
2022-07-12 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0551 |
2022-07-12 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-07-12 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-07-11 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |