DC PR24-0842 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-22 - Referred to Committee on Labor and Workforce Development
Pending: Council Labor and Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-22 - Referred to Committee on Labor and Workforce Development
Pending: Council Labor and Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Youth Apprenticeship Advisory Committee Dr. Burt Barnow Confirmation Resolution of 2022
Title
Youth Apprenticeship Advisory Committee Dr. Burt Barnow Confirmation Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-22 | Council | Referred to Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
2022-07-15 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0842 Published in the DC Register |
2022-07-14 | Council | Referred to Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
2022-07-12 | Council | Referred to Committee on Recreation, Libraries, and Youth Affairs |
2022-06-28 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR24-0842 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/49920/Introduction/PR24-0842-Introduction.pdf |