DC PR24-0811 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-21 - Resolution R24-0627, Effective from Oct 04, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 012734
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-21 - Resolution R24-0627, Effective from Oct 04, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 012734
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Director of the Office on Caribbean Affairs Natalee S. Sinder Confirmation Resolution of 2022
Title
Director of the Office on Caribbean Affairs Natalee S. Sinder Confirmation Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-04 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-21 | Council | Resolution R24-0627, Effective from Oct 04, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 012734 |
2022-10-04 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0627 |
2022-10-04 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-09-29 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-09-21 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR24-0811 |
2022-09-21 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-09-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-08-30 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-07-11 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2022-07-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-07-01 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0811 Published in the DC Register |
2022-06-28 | Council | Referred to Committee on Recreation, Libraries, and Youth Affairs |
2022-06-15 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |