DC PR24-0766 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-21 - Resolution R24-0626, Effective from Oct 04, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 012733
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-21 - Resolution R24-0626, Effective from Oct 04, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 012733
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Food Policy Council Karyn Bigelow Confirmation Resolution of 2022
Title
Food Policy Council Karyn Bigelow Confirmation Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-04 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-21 | Council | Resolution R24-0626, Effective from Oct 04, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 012733 |
2022-10-04 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0626 |
2022-10-04 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-09-28 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-09-27 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2022-09-26 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR24-0766 |
2022-09-08 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2022-07-13 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-06-10 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-06-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0766 Published in the DC Register |
2022-06-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-06-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2022-05-26 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |