DC PR24-0763 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-21 - Resolution R24-0624, Effective from Oct 04, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 012731
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-21 - Resolution R24-0624, Effective from Oct 04, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 012731
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
District of Columbia Water and Sewer Authority Board of Directors Howard Gibbs Confirmation Resolution of 2022
Title
District of Columbia Water and Sewer Authority Board of Directors Howard Gibbs Confirmation Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-04 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-21 | Council | Resolution R24-0624, Effective from Oct 04, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 012731 |
2022-10-04 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0624 |
2022-10-04 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-09-28 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-09-27 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2022-09-26 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR24-0763 |
2022-09-08 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2022-07-13 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-06-10 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-06-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0763 Published in the DC Register |
2022-06-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-06-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2022-05-25 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |