DC PR24-0686 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-29 - Resolution R24-0565, Effective from Jul 12, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 009433
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-29 - Resolution R24-0565, Effective from Jul 12, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 009433
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commission on Human Rights Charlotte Clymer Confirmation Resolution of 2022
Title
Commission on Human Rights Charlotte Clymer Confirmation Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-07-12 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-12 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-12 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-29 | Council | Resolution R24-0565, Effective from Jul 12, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 009433 |
2022-07-12 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0565 |
2022-07-12 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-07-07 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-07-06 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR24-0686 |
2022-07-06 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-07-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-06-30 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2022-05-27 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-05-19 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-04-22 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0686 Published in the DC Register |
2022-04-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Government Operations and Facilities |
2022-04-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |