DC PR24-0586 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-15 - Resolution R24-0418, Effective from Apr 05, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 003424
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-15 - Resolution R24-0418, Effective from Apr 05, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 003424
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sense of the Council in Support of Renaming the Chevy Chase Circle Fountain Resolution of 2022
Title
Sense of the Council in Support of Renaming the Chevy Chase Circle Fountain Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-15 | Council | Resolution R24-0418, Effective from Apr 05, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 003424 |
2022-04-05 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0418 |
2022-04-05 | Council | Final Reading |
2022-03-04 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0586 Published in the DC Register |
2022-03-01 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-02-14 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |