DC PR24-0583 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-01 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-01 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fiscal Year 2022 Supplemental Budget Request Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2022
Title
Fiscal Year 2022 Supplemental Budget Request Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-02-18 | Council | Resolution R24-0389, Effective from Feb 15, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 001282 |
2022-02-15 | Council | Final Reading |
2022-02-14 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |