DC PR24-0569 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Resolution R24-0378, Effective from Feb 01, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 001784
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Resolution R24-0378, Effective from Feb 01, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 001784
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Advisory Neighborhood Commission Redistricting Deadline Extension Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2022
Title
Advisory Neighborhood Commission Redistricting Deadline Extension Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Council - Postponed to February 15, 2022 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Council - Postponed to February 15, 2022 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | Council | Resolution R24-0378, Effective from Feb 01, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 001784 |
2022-02-01 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0378 |
2022-02-01 | Council | Final Reading |
2022-02-01 | Council | Postponed to February 15, 2022 |
2022-02-01 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-01-31 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |