DC PR24-0568 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-11 - Resolution R24-0379, Effective from Feb 01, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 001062
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-11 - Resolution R24-0379, Effective from Feb 01, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 001062
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tenant Payment Plan Phasing Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2022
Title
Tenant Payment Plan Phasing Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-11 | Council | Resolution R24-0379, Effective from Feb 01, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 001062 |
2022-02-01 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0379 |
2022-02-01 | Council | Final Reading |
2022-02-01 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-01-31 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |