DC PR24-0502 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-07 - Resolution R24-0315, Effective from Dec 07, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 000019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-07 - Resolution R24-0315, Effective from Dec 07, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 000019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Department of Health Functions Clarification Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2021
Title
Department of Health Functions Clarification Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-07 | Council | Resolution R24-0315, Effective from Dec 07, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 000019 |
2021-12-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0315 |
2021-12-07 | Council | Final Reading |
2021-12-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-12-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |