DC PR24-0472 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-11 - Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Corrections Information Council Governing Board Charlie Whitaker Confirmation Resolution of 2021

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corrections Information Council Governing Board Charlie Whitaker Confirmation Resolution of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-11CouncilWithdrawn
2021-11-19CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR24-0472 Published in the DC Register
2021-11-16CouncilReferred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2021-11-04CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback