DC PR24-0470 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-14 - Resolution R24-0347, Effective from Jan 04, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 000239
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-14 - Resolution R24-0347, Effective from Jan 04, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 000239
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
District of Columbia Board of Elections Michael Gill Confirmation Resolution of 2021
Title
District of Columbia Board of Elections Michael Gill Confirmation Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-04 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-04 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-04 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-14 | Council | Resolution R24-0347, Effective from Jan 04, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 000239 |
2022-01-04 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0347 |
2022-01-04 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-12-16 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2021-12-15 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR24-0470 |
2021-12-15 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-12-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-11-30 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2021-11-19 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-11-16 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-11-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0470 Published in the DC Register |
2021-11-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-10-28 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |