DC PR24-0445 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-11-24 - Committee Report Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

D.C. Preparatory Academy Revenue Bonds Project Approval Resolution of 2021

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

D.C. Preparatory Academy Revenue Bonds Project Approval Resolution of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-24CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2021-11-17CouncilCommittee Mark-up of PR24-0445
2021-11-17CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2021-11-16CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-11-10CouncilRoundtable Hearing Held
2021-11-08CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-11-05CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR24-0445 Published in the DC Register
2021-11-02CouncilReferred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
2021-10-25CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback