DC PR24-0441 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-09 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-09 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Commission on Fathers, Men, and Boys David Gaston Confirmation Resolution of 2021
Title
Commission on Fathers, Men, and Boys David Gaston Confirmation Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-09 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2021-12-06 | Council | Withdrawn |
2021-11-19 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-11-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-11-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0441 Published in the DC Register |
2021-11-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Recreation, Libraries, and Youth Affairs |
2021-10-21 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR24-0441 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/48121/Introduction/PR24-0441-Introduction.pdf |