DC PR24-0429 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-07 - Approved with Resolution Number R24-0303
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-07 - Approved with Resolution Number R24-0303
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Citizen Review Panel Dr. Wanda Thompson Appointment Resolution of 2021
Title
Citizen Review Panel Dr. Wanda Thompson Appointment Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0303 |
2021-12-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-11-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2021-10-29 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0429 Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-27 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2021-10-21 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-19 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |