DC PR24-0428 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-07 - Approved with Resolution Number R24-0302
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-07 - Approved with Resolution Number R24-0302
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
District of Columbia Housing Authority Board of Commissioners Raymond A. Skinner Appointment Resolution of 2021
Title
District of Columbia Housing Authority Board of Commissioners Raymond A. Skinner Appointment Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0302 |
2021-12-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-10-27 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2021-10-22 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0428 Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-21 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2021-10-18 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |