DC PR24-0427 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-07 - Approved with Resolution Number R24-0301
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-07 - Approved with Resolution Number R24-0301
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Commission on Health Equity Alicia Wilson Reappointment Resolution of 2021
Title
Commission on Health Equity Alicia Wilson Reappointment Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0301 |
2021-12-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-10-27 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2021-10-22 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0427 Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-21 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2021-10-18 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |