DC PR24-0393 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-14 - Resolution R24-0298, Effective from Dec 07, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 000218
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-14 - Resolution R24-0298, Effective from Dec 07, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 000218
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State Superintendent of Education Dr. Christina Grant Confirmation Resolution of 2021
Title
State Superintendent of Education Dr. Christina Grant Confirmation Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-14 | Council | Resolution R24-0298, Effective from Dec 07, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 000218 |
2022-01-03 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2021-12-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0298 |
2021-12-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-12-07 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR24-0393 |
2021-11-12 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-11-12 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-10-22 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-22 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0393 Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2021-10-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-05 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |