DC PR24-0392 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-16 - Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-16 - Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Commission on Fashion Arts and Events Darel Dawson Confirmation Resolution of 2021
Title
Commission on Fashion Arts and Events Darel Dawson Confirmation Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-16 | Council | Withdrawn |
2021-10-22 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0392 Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Government Operations and Facilities |
2021-10-05 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR24-0392 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/47985/Introduction/PR24-0392-Introduction.pdf |