DC PR24-0387 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-19 - Resolution R24-0274, Effective from Nov 02, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 012197
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Child Support Guidelines Commission Councilmember Charles Allen Reappointment Resolution of 2021

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Support Guidelines Commission Councilmember Charles Allen Reappointment Resolution of 2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-11-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-19CouncilResolution R24-0274, Effective from Nov 02, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 012197
2021-11-02CouncilApproved with Resolution Number R24-0274
2021-11-02CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2021-10-08CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR24-0387 Published in the DC Register
2021-10-05CouncilRetained by the Council
2021-10-01CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback