DC PR24-0380 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Comprehensive Plan Future Land Use Map and Generalized Policy Map Approval Resolution of 2021

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Comprehensive Plan Future Land Use Map and Generalized Policy Map Approval Resolution of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-03CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2021-10-08CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-10-08CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR24-0380 Published in the DC Register
2021-10-05CouncilReferred to Committee on Committee of the Whole
2021-10-01CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback