DC PR24-0361 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Resolution R24-0249, Effective from Oct 05, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 010716
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Resolution R24-0249, Effective from Oct 05, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 010716
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Metropolitan Police Department Overtime Spending Accountability Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2021
Title
Metropolitan Police Department Overtime Spending Accountability Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | Council | Resolution R24-0249, Effective from Oct 05, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 010716 |
2021-10-05 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0249 |
2021-10-05 | Council | Final Reading |
2021-10-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-10-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |