DC PR24-0358 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-02 - Approved with Resolution Number R24-0267
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-02 - Approved with Resolution Number R24-0267
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
District of Columbia Retirement Board Adam Weers Appointment Resolution of 2021
Title
District of Columbia Retirement Board Adam Weers Appointment Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-02 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0267 |
2021-11-02 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-10-20 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2021-10-08 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0358 Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2021-10-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |