DC PR24-0348 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-13 - Resolution R24-0226, Effective from Aug 10, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 008022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-13 - Resolution R24-0226, Effective from Aug 10, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 008022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fiscal Year 2022 Income Tax Secured Revenue Bond, General Obligation Bond, and General Obligation and Income Tax Secured Bond Anticipation Note Issuance Authorization Emergency Approval Resolution of 2021
Title
Fiscal Year 2022 Income Tax Secured Revenue Bond, General Obligation Bond, and General Obligation and Income Tax Secured Bond Anticipation Note Issuance Authorization Emergency Approval Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-10 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-10 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-10 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-13 | Council | Resolution R24-0226, Effective from Aug 10, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 008022 |
2021-08-10 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0226 |
2021-08-10 | Council | Final Reading |
2021-08-10 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-08-05 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |