DC PR24-0336 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Resolution R24-0210, Effective from Jul 13, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 007183
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Green Finance Authority Board Quorum Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2021

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Green Finance Authority Board Quorum Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-07-13 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-23CouncilResolution R24-0210, Effective from Jul 13, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 007183
2021-07-13CouncilApproved with Resolution Number R24-0210
2021-07-13CouncilFinal Reading
2021-07-13CouncilRetained by the Council
2021-07-12CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback