DC PR24-0326 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-26 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-26 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Director of the District Department of Transportation Everett Lott Confirmation Resolution of 2021
Title
Director of the District Department of Transportation Everett Lott Confirmation Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-26 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-10-26 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2021-09-10 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-09-03 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-09-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-08-30 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-07-16 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0326 Published in the DC Register |
2021-07-13 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2021-07-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR24-0326 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/47605/Introduction/PR24-0326-Introduction.pdf |