DC PR24-0294 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Resolution R24-0152, Effective from Jun 29, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 006805
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Resolution R24-0152, Effective from Jun 29, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 006805
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Contract No. CW87285 with Standard Insurance Company Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2021
Title
Contract No. CW87285 with Standard Insurance Company Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-09 | Council | Resolution R24-0152, Effective from Jun 29, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 006805 |
2021-06-29 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0152 |
2021-06-29 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-06-29 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-06-21 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |