DC PR24-0289 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Resolution R24-0150, Effective from Jun 29, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 006953
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Resolution R24-0150, Effective from Jun 29, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 006953
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modification Nos. 03 and 04 to Contract No. DCAM-20-NC-RFP-0001D with RBK Construction, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2021
Title
Modification Nos. 03 and 04 to Contract No. DCAM-20-NC-RFP-0001D with RBK Construction, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Council | Resolution R24-0150, Effective from Jun 29, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 006953 |
2021-06-29 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0150 |
2021-06-29 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-06-29 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-06-16 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |