DC PR24-0274 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Resolution R24-0199, Effective from Jul 13, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 007175
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Resolution R24-0199, Effective from Jul 13, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 007175
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modification Nos. 11 and 12 to Contract No. CW63336 with Adrian L. Merton, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2021
Title
Modification Nos. 11 and 12 to Contract No. CW63336 with Adrian L. Merton, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-13 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-07-13 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-07-13 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-23 | Council | Resolution R24-0199, Effective from Jul 13, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 007175 |
2021-07-13 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0199 |
2021-07-13 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-06-15 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-06-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |