DC PR24-0256 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Resolution R24-0117, Effective from Jun 01, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 006116
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Resolution R24-0117, Effective from Jun 01, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 006116
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifications to Contract No. CW64488 with Capital Area Asset Builders (CAAB) Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2021
Title
Modifications to Contract No. CW64488 with Capital Area Asset Builders (CAAB) Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-11 | Council | Resolution R24-0117, Effective from Jun 01, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 006116 |
2021-06-01 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0117 |
2021-06-01 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-06-01 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-05-20 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |