DC PR24-0248 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Resolution R24-0107, Effective from May 18, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 005612
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Resolution R24-0107, Effective from May 18, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 005612
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Coronavirus Public Health Extension Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2021
Title
Coronavirus Public Health Extension Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Council | Resolution R24-0107, Effective from May 18, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 005612 |
2021-05-18 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0107 |
2021-05-18 | Council | Final Reading |
2021-05-18 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-05-17 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |